Kaki, Abdullah Mohammad Ahmad (CPSO#: 65948)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 15 Aug 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 16 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1997