Kaki, Reham Mohammedsaeed Seraj (CPSO#: 88132)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2008 to 28 Apr 2008
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015