Kako, Christian Yuzuru (CPSO#: 63742)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
All About Health
Unit E
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 1P3
Phone: (905) 884-0666
Fax: (905) 884-5317
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Written requests for medical records should be faxed to Dr. Kako at (905) 554-0522
Date Received: 21 Jan 2008


Address: Written requests for medical records should be sent to: Attn: Dr. Christian Yuzuru Kako Queens Quay Medical Centre 266B Queens Quay West Toronto, ON M5J 1B5
Date Received: 17 Jan 2008

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN YUZURU KAKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAKO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992