Kalache, Dima (CPSO#: 110620)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 11 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2017