Kalache, Yahya Mohamed (CPSO#: 83836)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2005 to 24 Jan 2006
PEAP - Resident - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jan 2006 to 24 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jan 2007 to 24 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jan 2008 to 24 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jan 2009 to 16 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Apr 2009