Kaladeen, Stephen Mahendra (CPSO#: 59706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
64 Ontario Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6H9
Phone: (613) 394-1610
Fax: (613) 394-1570
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Kaladeen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kaladeen ( CPSO# 59706 )

Business Address:
64 Ontario Street
Trenton ON  K8V 6H9
Phone Number: (613) 394-1610

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN MAHENDRA KALADEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALADEEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989