Kalaichandran, Sivasamboo (CPSO#: 67510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Nov 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada, Tamil

Education:Mysore University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 409
2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 431-5592
Fax: (416) 289-6536
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kalaichandran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kalaichandran ( CPSO# 67510 )

Business Address:
409 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 431-5592

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 06 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 06 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]

            As from November 6, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sivasamboo
            Kalaichandran, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Kalaichandran to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario: 

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                     DR. SIVASAMBOO KALAICHANDRAN
                                         ("Dr. Kalaichandran")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, certificate of registration number 67510, am a
                  member of the College.  The College has received information regarding my
                  standard of practice which led to the College investigation bearing File
                  Number 88141 (the "Investigation").

            (3)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, acknowledge that the College has agreed to resolve
                  the Investigation on the basis of this Undertaking as signed by me.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, understand and agree that I am bound by this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign it. 

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, undertake that, effective immediately, I will
                        cease to engage in any of the following:
                  
                        (i)surgery; 
                        (ii)colposcopy.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, acknowledge that the practice restriction
                        described in section (5)(a)(i) does not include practising as a
                        surgical assistant under the direction of a surgeon approved by the
                        College (a "Qualified Surgeon"); and for further clarity, but
                        without limiting the generality of this section:
                  
                        (i)   I will not provide any pre-operative or post-operative care
                              whatsoever; and
                        (ii)  a Qualified Surgeon must always be physically in attendance
                              when I am engaging in my practice as a surgical assistant. 
                  
            (6)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in medical record
                              keeping.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, undertake to provide proof to the College of
                        my successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (6)(a)  within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the professional education set out in section (6)(a).
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, undertake to inform the College of each and
                        every location where I practise or have privileges, including, but
                        not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, undertake and agree that I will submit to,
                        and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice
                        Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the
                        purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP
                        consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, undertake to comply with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Kalaichandran, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Kalaichandran, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and
                  understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained
                  independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or
                  have waived my right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Kalaichandran, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking
                  constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of
                  registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand
                  that this Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that
                  is available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (12)  I, Dr. Kalaichandran, acknowledge that the following summary will appear
                  on the College's Register that is available to the public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Kalaichandran was the subject of a College investigation into
                        whether   he fell below the standard of practice of the profession.
                        As a result of the investigation, Dr. Kalaichandran must not
                        perform surgery or colposcopy. Dr. Kalaichandran will also complete
                        a course satisfactory to the College in medical record keeping.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Kalaichandran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with
                  similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"),
                  and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College
                  has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking
                  and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                  this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Kalaichandran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                  provide the following information to all Qualified Surgeons, Chiefs of
                  Surgery, and any person who requires this information for the purposes of
                  facilitating my completion of the professional education set out in
                  section (6) above:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Kalaichandran, give my irrevocable consent to all Qualified
                  Surgeons, Chiefs of Surgery, and any person who facilitates my completion
                  of the professional education set out in section (6) above to disclose to
                  the College any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or 
                  
                  (c)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (6) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 6, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sivasamboo Kalaichandran to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 6, 2015:

Dr. Kalaichandran was the subject of a College investigation into whether he fell below the standard of practice of the profession. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Kalaichandran must not perform surgery or colposcopy. Dr. Kalaichandran will also complete a course satisfactory to the College in medical record keeping.