Kalaparambath, Tefy Paul (CPSO#: 69005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
200 Ronson Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5Z9
Phone: (416) 740-7200
Fax: (416) 740-6100
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre
89 Queensway West
Suite 608
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7120
Fax: (905) 848-7515
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kalaparambath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kalaparambath ( CPSO# 69005 )

Business Address:
104 - 200 Ronson Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5Z9
Phone Number: (416) 740-7200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEFY PAUL KALAPARAMBATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALAPARAMBATH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2000