Kalapos, Paul (CPSO#: 50874)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2010