Kalapurackal, Mathew Mathew (CPSO#: 58796)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Nov 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Padova, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Aug 1990 to 25 Nov 1990
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Nov 1990