Kalaydjian, Gregory (CPSO#: 108520)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Windsor University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 01 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 02 May 2016 to 05 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2017 to 22 Sep 2017
Elective Trainee - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2017