Kalbfleisch, Richard Edward (CPSO#: 31083)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients can contact Dr. Carolyn Best cpso# 81149 (please see the cpso website for her contacat information at www.cpso.on.ca She has taken over Dr. Kalbfleisch's practice.
Instructions: see above
Date Received: 11 Feb 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012