Kalchman, Marc Jonathan (CPSO#: 62144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Seymour-Hannah SportsPlex
240 St Paul Street West
St Catharines ON  L2S 2E7
Phone: (905) 688-9338
Fax: (905) 688-2398
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Peninsula Children's Centre
567 Glenridge
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc J. Kalchman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kalchman ( CPSO# 62144 )

Business Address:
Seymour-Hannah SportsPlex
240 St Paul Street West
St Catharines ON  L2S 2E7
Phone Number: (905) 688-9338

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
St. Catherines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC JONATHAN KALCHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALCHMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1991