Kalenga, Jean-Claude (CPSO#: 97049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: Kalenga, Mukengeshayi (used until: 29 Jan 2013 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Swahili

Education:Universite de Kinshasa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. C. Kalenga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kalenga ( CPSO# 97049 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
Benton Medical Clinic
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Phone Number: (226) 240-3014

Business Address:
418 Eglinton Avenue West
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5N 1A2
Phone Number: (647) 479-8779

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-CLAUDE KALENGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALENGA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011