Kallie, Neville Raymond (CPSO#: 41276)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005