Kalman, Peter George (CPSO#: 30729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: 905-889-1125
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reisman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Reisman ( CPSO# 51488 )
Dr. P. Kalman ( CPSO# 30729 )

Business Address:
9 Edgar Avenue
Toronto ON  M4W 2B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-9089

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Shouldice Hospital Ltd. Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GEORGE KALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1978 to 18 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Research Fellows - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Oct 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008