Kalnas, John Jonas (CPSO#: 29180)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012