Kalnins, Richard Edward Boris (CPSO#: 61078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Union Medical Centre
Unit 7
5550 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1C 3B2
Phone: (416) 283-3700
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD EDWARD BORIS KALNINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALNINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1991