Kaloni, Rita (CPSO#: 73943)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 845-4511
Fax: (905) 845-8133
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rita Kaloni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kaloni ( CPSO# 73943 )

Business Address:
Suite 502
345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 845-4511

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITA KALONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALONI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001