Kaloty, Roopinder Kaur (CPSO#: 106559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3359 Mississauga Road, Rm 1123A
WIlliam G. Davis Building
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C6
Phone: 905-828-5255
Fax: 905-828-3852
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

77 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6060
Fax: 416-323-6351
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Room C210
7899 Mclaughlin Road
Brampton ON  L6Y 5H9
Canada
Phone: (905) 459-7533 Ext. 5153
Fax: (905) 874-4388
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROOPINDER KAUR KALOTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALOTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017