Kaluzienski, Mark Henry (CPSO#: 79556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8010
Fax: (613) 737-8115
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-6521
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK HENRY KALUZIENSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALUZIENSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009