Kalyniuk, Norman Joseph (CPSO#: 58557)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#208
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 898-7811
Fax: (905) 898-0963
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

556 Bryne Dr.
Barrie ON  L4N 6B5
Canada
Phone: (705) 726-2004
Fax: (705) 726-4449
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Norman J. Kalyniuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kalyniuk ( CPSO# 58557 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (905) 898-7811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NORMAN JOSEPH KALYNIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALYNIUK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)