Kam, Alice Sau Han (CPSO#: 91421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kafai Lai & Alice Sau Han Kam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lai ( CPSO# 91806 )
Dr. A. Kam ( CPSO# 91421 )

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 12 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALICE SAU HAN KAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2015