Kamal, Madeeha Mohammed Salman (CPSO#: 69726)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Baghdad, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000