Kamangar, Elham (CPSO#: 83702)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: Ahani Kamangar, Elham (used until: 07 May 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kashan Univ. of Medical Sc & Health Serv, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2005 to 11 Nov 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2005 to 30 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011