Kamath, Vranda Suresh (CPSO#: 70508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Konkani, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 432-7350
Fax: (519) 432-0949
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

InMedic Pain Management Centres
685 Adelaide St North
London ON  N5Y 2L4
Canada
Phone: (519) 601-7171
Fax: (519) 601-7174
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Pain Clinic
Alexandra Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 485-9611
Fax: (519) 485-9601
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kamath ( CPSO# 70508 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 432-7350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VRANDA SURESH KAMATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1998 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1999