Kambites, Gerasimos Ioannis (CPSO#: 61966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
R R 1
110 Kilmarnock Road
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 5B8
Phone: (613) 284-2361
Fax: (613) 284-2551
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gerasimos Kambites Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kambites ( CPSO# 61966 )

Business Address:
RR 1
110 Kilmarnock Road
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 5B8
Phone Number: (613) 284-2361

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERASIMOS IOANNIS KAMBITES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMBITES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2001
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 06 Jan 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Sep 2001
Summary:

On September 26, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Kambites  plea of guilty and 
found him guilty of professional misconduct under paragraph 29.22 of O.Reg. 548, in that he 
failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.  Subsequently, the Discipline 
Committee ordered the following penalty: 
 
1.    Dr. Kambites is to be reprimanded and such is to be recorded on the register. 
 
2.    Dr. Kambites  license to practice medicine in Ontario shall be suspended for a period of 
      six (6) months, commencing on October 6, 2001 or such other date as the Registrar may 
      direct. 
 
      Three (3) months of the said suspension shall itself be suspended provided that: 
      (a)   Dr. Kambites continues to attend a psychiatrist for treatment on a regular basis for 
            a minimum period of twelve (12) months or such additional period of time as that 
            psychiatrist deems necessary for treatment addressing boundary issues and 
            rescidivism. 
      (b)   The psychiatrist must be one who is acceptable to the Registrar.  The Registrar, if 
            he thinks it is necessary to do so, may require the treating psychiatrist to sign an 
            undertaking relating to his treatment of Dr. Kambites, in conformity with this 
            order.   
      (c)   The treating psychiatrist will file written reports with the College at the following 
            intervals; namely, three (3) months, one (1) year, and, if necessary, semi-annually 
            until the end of the treatment specified in paragraph (a) above. 
      (d)   The report to be delivered at the twelve (12) month time frame shall indicate 
            whether further treatment to address boundary issues and rescidivism is necessary. 
      (e)   Any costs related to this treatment and these reports not covered by OHIP shall be 
            Dr. Kambites  responsibility. 
 
3.    Any breach of the above conditions relating to psychiatric treatment will result in the 
      nullification of the suspended portion of the suspension, dictating that the balance of the 
      original suspension is to be served. 
 
4.    Dr. Kambites will undertake a boundaries course acceptable to the Registrar within one 
      year of today s date at his own expense. 
 
5.    Dr. Kambites will pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500 forthwith. 
 
 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 26, 2001


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Nov 1999
Summary:

 On November 15, 1999 by way of an Agreed Statement of Facts, Admission and Consent Disposition, the 
 Discipline Committee found Dr. Kambites guilty of professional misconduct and ordered the 
 following penalty:

1)	to appear before it to be reprimanded and directs that the fact of the 
 reprimand be recorded in the Register;
2)	to pay a fine of $5,000.00 to the Minister of Finance 
 within 60 days of the date of this order; and
3)	to pay costs and expenses to the College in the 
 amount of $2,500.00 within 60 days of the date of this order.

In the event that Dr. Kambites 
 fails to comply with any of the terms of this order, the Discipline Committee directs the 
 Registrar to suspend Dr. Kambites( certificate of registration until such time as the terms of 
 this order have been met.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 15, 1999