Kamble, Vaibhav Arvind (CPSO#: 66985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Marathi

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6212
Fax: (416) 469-6874
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vaibhav Kamble Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kamble ( CPSO# 66985 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VAIBHAV ARVIND KAMBLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMBLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993