Kambo, Jaspreet Singh (CPSO#: 103395)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal University Hospital
103 Hospital Drive
Saskatoon SK  S7N 0W8
Phone: (306) 655-1000
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Pauls Hospital
1702 20 Street West
Saskatoon SK  S7M 0Z9
Canada
Phone: (306) 655-5000
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASPREET SINGH KAMBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMBO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2014 to 29 Jun 2014
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2017