Kamel, Kamel Sobhy (CPSO#: 52980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 1989

Summary

Former Name: Bolis, Kamel Sobhy Kamel (used until: 27 Jan 1985 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 867-7479
Fax: (416) 867-3709
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Kamel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kamel ( CPSO# 52980 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 867-7479

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMEL SOBHY KAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1989