Kamel, Mona Kamel (CPSO#: 65725)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4532 Credit Pointe Dr
Mississauga ON  L5M 3M2
Phone: (647) 991-9475
Fax: (905) 848-8183
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kamel ( CPSO# 65725 )

Business Address:
4532 Credit Pointe Drive
Mississauga ON  L5M 3M2
Phone Number: (905) 567-9475

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONA KAMEL KAMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1997