Kamian, Kambiz (CPSO#: 82084)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 16 Mar 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011