Kaminer, Mendel (CPSO#: 19300)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 May 2007