Kaminska, Elzbieta Anna (CPSO#: 62078)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Pomeranian Academy of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 2012