Kaminski, Michael (CPSO#: 26716)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Polish, Russian

Education:Slaska Academy of Medicine, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 205, 4949 Bathurst Street, North York, ON M2R 1Y1, (416) 225-8809
Instructions: Records are in the care of Dr. Anna Fernando
Date Received: 26 Nov 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2015
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2015
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016

Pending Hearings

Summary: Dr. Michael Kaminski (August 9, 2017) Allegations of Dr. Michael Kaminski’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. Dr. Kaminski entered into an undertaking with the College whereby he voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions effective May 30, 2015. It is alleged that Dr. Kaminski engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by practicing medicine after May 30, 2015, contrary to the terms of his undertaking.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): March 15, 2018

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 Aug 1993
Summary:

 In August 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kaminski guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Kaminski be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register, and that he be fined $5000.00.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Dec 1992