Kammila, Srinu (CPSO#: 78922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Apr 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Nephrology and Hypertension Clinic
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5147
Fax: (705) 876-5178
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Kidney Care Clinic
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 876-5078
Fax: 705 876-5079
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

1000 Depalma Dr
Hemodialysis unit
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
Phone: 9053777735
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

10 Angeline St North
Hemodialysis Unit
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Canada
Phone: 7053287308
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beaubien Cheung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Srinu Kammila Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kammila ( CPSO# 78922 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5078

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7735

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 326-6111

Business Address:
815 High Street East
Peterborough ON  K9J 8J9
Phone Number: (705) 876-8737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SRINU KAMMILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMMILA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2003