Kampf, Nurith Noreen (CPSO#: 63670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leaside Health Centre
795 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4G 4E4
Phone: (416) 424-3145
Fax: (416) 424-2611
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NURITH NOREEN KAMPF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMPF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1992