Kamra, Chander Parkash (CPSO#: 50878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Mar 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Health Science Centre
Prince Philip Drive
St. John's NL  A1A 9E8
Phone: (709) 777-6540
Fax: (709) 579-4954

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANDER PARKASH KAMRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 31 Dec 1983
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1996