Kan, Julio Wai Ho (CPSO#: 54057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7020
Fax: (905) 472-7078
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julio Wai Ho Kan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kan ( CPSO# 54057 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7020

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L0C 1K0
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Business Address:
6212 Main Street
Stouffville ON  L4A 2S5
Phone Number: (905) 640-2243

Business Address:
202 - 110 Copper Creek Drive
Markham ON  L6B 0P9
Phone Number: (905) 471-6996

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIO WAI HO KAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1990