Kan, Peter (CPSO#: 88410)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 04 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012