Kan, Simon Yat-Sing (CPSO#: 45115)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Chicago, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1987
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 01 Jun 2000
Summary:

 On June 1, 2000, the Fitness to Practise Committee finds Dr. Kan to be incapacitated.  The 
 Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Kan(s certificate of registration on an indefinite 
 basis, with the proviso that he may apply for reinstatement, with supporting evidence, if in the 
 future he wishes to do so.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 01 Jun 2000