Kanagaratnam, Sivaruban (CPSO#: 91744)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 09 May 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Moscow State University of Medicine & De, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
178-200 West St.
St. Anthony NL  A0K 4S0
Phone: (709) 454-3333

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 May 2014