Kanalec, Andro Deni (CPSO#: 58274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Independent Medical Consultant -
Have no fixed practise address
- Consult at various firms/companys
Toronto ON  M9A 4G1
Phone: 416-837-2390
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRO DENI KANALEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANALEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 May 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988