Kanawaty, David Sam (CPSO#: 55758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 123
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 221-2005
Fax: (416) 221-5239
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SAM KANAWATY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANAWATY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1987