Kandasamy, Thileeban (CPSO#: 88451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
685 Sheppard Ave East
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Phone: (416) 499-5558
Fax: (416) 499-9392
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave., Room M1 102
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4138
Fax: (416) 480-5761
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Kandasamy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kandasamy ( CPSO# 88451 )
Dr. T. Jeyanathan ( CPSO# 91343 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
Suite 402
685 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 499-5558

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4138

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THILEEBAN KANDASAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDASAMY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013