Kandel, Gabor Peter (CPSO#: 50879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
16th floor -room 060a
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3093
Fax: (416) 864-3002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gabor Kandel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kandel ( CPSO# 95948 )
Dr. G. Kandel ( CPSO# 50879 )
Dr. R. Kandel ( CPSO# 50880 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 16-500
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3093

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABOR PETER KANDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1978 to 18 Jun 1979
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1998

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Nov 1991
Summary:

 In November 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Kandel guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an 
 act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, 
 the Committee ordered that Dr. Kandel be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
 recorded on the Register, and that he be fined $5000.00.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 28 Nov 1991