Kandel, Rita Arbetman (CPSO#: 50880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Pathology & Lab Medicine
Room 6-500
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8516
Fax: (416) 586-8719
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gabor Kandel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kandel ( CPSO# 95948 )
Dr. G. Kandel ( CPSO# 50879 )
Dr. R. Kandel ( CPSO# 50880 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 16-500
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3093

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITA ARBETMAN KANDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1987