Kane, Gabrielle Martina (CPSO#: 56611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Mar 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Washington School Med
Department of Radiation Oncology
1959 North East Pacific Street
Box 356043
Seattle WA  98195-6043
United States
Phone: (206) 598-4121
Fax: (206) 598-3786

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 28 May 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIELLE MARTINA KANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1986