Kane-Corriveau, Sandra Patricia (CPSO#: 66545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Dundas Street
Dundas ON  L9H 1A1
Phone: (905) 628-6151
Fax: (905) 628-1609
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandra Kane-Corriveau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kane-Corriveau ( CPSO# 66545 )

Business Address:
33 Dundas Street
Dundas ON  L9H 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 628-6151

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA PATRICIA KANE-CORRIVEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANE-CORRIVEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995