Kanee, Allan Samuel (CPSO#: 62543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Obstetrics
Gynaecology Associates
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 502
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 820-8748
Fax: (905) 820-0255
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kanee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Weisdorf ( CPSO# 64074 )
Dr. A. Kanee ( CPSO# 62543 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Obstetrics
Gynaecology Associates
502 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 820-8748

Business Address:
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3728

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN SAMUEL KANEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1991